Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
26.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
10.03.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] |
29.07.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |