Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2702434 | 21.04.1995 | B1 | FR2702434 | 16.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9302697 | 09.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2702435 | 21.04.1995 | B1 | FR2702435 | 16.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9302698 | 09.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2702509 | 28.04.1995 | B1 | FR2702509 | 16.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9302696 | 09.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2705631 | 21.07.1995 | B1 | FR2705631 | 02.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9306216 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0614791 | Global Dossier | 14.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9302697 | 09.03.1993 | FR9306216 | 25.05.1993 | FR9302698 | 09.03.1993 | FR9302696 | 09.03.1993 |