EP0614791 - Antitheft device for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avignon, Bruno THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Barre, Charles THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 03 /
Bois, Arnaud THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 04 /
Canal, Yves THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 05 /
Maigrot, Claude THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 06 /
Tessier, Gérard THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400494.4 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | FR19930002697 | 09.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9302697 | FR19930002696 | 09.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9302696 | FR19930002698 | 09.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9302698 | FR19930006216 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9306216 | [1994/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614791 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04, B60R25/00, E05B49/00 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
B60R25/005 (EP);
B60R25/04 (EP);
B60R25/042 (EP);
G07C2009/00761 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/37] | Title | German: | Antidiebstahlvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1994/37] | English: | Antitheft device for motor vehicle | [1994/37] | French: | Dispositif antivol pour voiture automobile | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0377816 (WERNER HAUER) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 7, line 24 - line 42; figures 3,5 *; | [XA]EP0373337 (DELTA ELETTRONICA) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 22 - line 47 * [A] 2; | [XAY]WO8103002 (BLAIS AUTO SECURITY) [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 13, line 1 - line 30 * * page 14, line 15 - line 16 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 1; figure 1 * [A] 5,7,8 [Y] 2; | [XA]GB2219827 (ANTHONY MARTIN KNIGHT) [X] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 5 - line 10 * * page 3, line 18 - line 23 * * page 8, line 26 - line 35 * * page 17, line 17 - line 21 * [A] 9; | [A]GB2141779 (MALCOLM JOHN HAY ET AL.) [A] 1-6,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS6299266 ; | [A]EP0365866 (HANS-JOACHIM ZIMMER) [A] 1-6,8 * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0393660 (KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract *; | [A]FR2494534 (SWF-SPEZIALFABRIK FÜR AUTOZUBEHÖR GUSTAV RAU) [A] 10,14 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]US4209782 (NORBERT DONATH, BERNARD DONATH) [A] 10,12 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 11 * * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US3622998 (KORTMAN JOE M, et al); | [A]US5084697 (SHIH-MING HWANG) [A] 19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0292759 (PETER WILHELM) [A] 20,21,29,32 * column 1, line 11 - line 13 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0377128 (ALBERT GRIESEMER) [A] 20,21,29,32 * abstract *; | [A]GB2141779 (MALCOLM JOHN HAY ET AL.) [A] 20,29,33 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3507593 (GTE GESELLSCHAFT FÜR TECHNOLOGIEENTWICKLUNG UND VERTRIEB) [A] 20,22-26,30,33 * page 6, line 8 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0192527 (DANIEL CLAVIER) [A] 20-22,29,30 * page 4, line 28 - line 39 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 7 *; | [A]US4749873 (MUTOH ET AL.) [A] 1,34,38 * column 2, line 10 - line 46 * * column 4, line 13 - column 6 *; | [A]EP0475800 (LE COUTURIER) [A] 1,34,38 * column 1 - column 5 * * column 11, line 23 - line 31 * * revendicaitons;figures *; | [A]WO8907815 (AUSTRALIAN SECURITY, TECHNOLOGY AND DEVELOPMENT) [A] 1,34,38 * page 1, line 23 - page 6, line 23 *; | [A]FR2584034 (BARBERA) [A] 1,34,38 * page 1 - page 5, line 6 * * figures *; | [A]FR2569641 (KIEKERT) [A] 1,34,38 * page 3, line 2 - page 6, line 12; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2200086 (CHANDLER) [A] 1,34,36,38,39 * the whole document *; | [A]US4133410 (KRUSOE) [A] 1,34,35,38,39 * the whole document *; | [A]US4292620 (PAGANE) [A] 34,35,38,39 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 46 *; | [A]DE2427258 (YMOS METALLWERKE WOLF & BECKER)) [A] 38 * page 4, line 6 - page 7, line 5; figures 1-3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871015), vol. 11, no. 316, Database accession no. (M - 631), & JP62099266 A 19870508 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 2 * abstract * |