EP0616484 - Magnetoresistive transducer und manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etienne, Patrick THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Schuhl, Alain THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400559.4 | 15.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | FR19930003206 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9303206 | [1994/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616484 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04R15/00, G01R33/06 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
G01R33/09 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,US);
H04R15/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/38] | Title | German: | Magnetoresistiver Wandler und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1994/38] | English: | Magnetoresistive transducer und manufacturing method | [1994/38] | French: | Transducteur magnétorésistif et procédé de réalisation | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/25] | 16.12.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0152000 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0221540 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0406060 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |