EP0618509 - Electrophotographic toner receptive release coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartusiak, Joseph Thomas, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Kantner, Steven Shepard, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400679.0 | 30.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | US19930040876 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: US 40876 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618509 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618509 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G7/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
G03G7/0086 (EP);
G03G7/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/40] | Title | German: | Nichtklebende Beschichtungen zur Aufnahme von elektrophotographischen Tonern | [1999/40] | English: | Electrophotographic toner receptive release coatings | [1994/40] | French: | Revêtements non-adhesive réceptives aux révélateurs électrophotographiques | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/40] | Elektrophotographische Toner-aufnehmende, nichtklebende Beschichtungen | Examination procedure | 13.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Request for further processing for: | 09.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2000 | [2001/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5719753 ; | [A]JPS5430036 ; | [A]US4942410 (FITCH JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0437073 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 14, line 10 - page 16, line 18; claims 1-11; table 3 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 10, Database accession no. 82-18959E (10), & JPS5719753 A 19820202 (RICOH K.K.) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 15, Database accession no. 79-28802B (15), & JPS5430036 A 19790306 (CANON K.K.) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |