EP0620406 - Gas cooker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE POUR L'EQUIPEMENT MENAGER "CEPEM" 18 rue du 11 Octobre F-45140 St Jean-de-la-Ruelle / FR | [1994/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Deuff, Christian THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Dubois, Hervé THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/42] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400734.3 | 05.04.1994 | [1994/42] | Priority number, date | FR19930004261 | 09.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9304261 | [1994/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0620406 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0620406 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/12 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
F24C3/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/42] | Title | German: | Gaskocher | [1994/42] | English: | Gas cooker | [1994/42] | French: | Appareil de cuisson à gaz | [1994/42] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2489485 (USINES ET FONDERIES ARTHUR MARTIN) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]FR2686148 (CLV PRODUCTION) [PX] 1 * figure -; claims 1-11 *; | [A]DE8701926U (BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE); | [A]GB2223093 (SUPERLUCK ELECTRICS); | [A]GB2169740 (LICENTIA GMBH) |