EP0621388 - Door with a bar lock with improved lock mounting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS DECAYEUX Rue Jules Guesde F-80210 Feuquières-en-Vimeu / FR | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decayeux, Etienne 2 rue de la République F-80210 Feuquieres en Vimeu / FR | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Lhuillier, René, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400811.9 | 14.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | FR19930004569 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9304569 | [1994/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621388 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621388 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/76, E06B5/10, E05C9/00 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
E06B3/822 (EP);
E06B5/11 (EP);
E06B2003/7046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/43] | Title | German: | Tür mit Stangenverschluss mit verbessertem Schlosseinbau | [1994/43] | English: | Door with a bar lock with improved lock mounting means | [1994/43] | French: | Porte à serrure-bandeau, comportant des moyens perfectionnés de montage de la serrure sur la porte | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2385877 (FICHET-BAUCHE) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 27; figure - *; | [A]FR2581122 (FIAND-FAVORIT) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2670820 (WORTHINGTON) [A] 2,4 * column 3, line 16 - line 40; figure - *; | [A]FR2320686 (C.I.S.A. & C.I.R.) [A] 6 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 2 - line 11 * * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 2 * * figure - * |