EP0624575 - Substituted indoles and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert 92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert F-92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caubere, Paul 11, rue de Serre F-54000 Nancy / FR | 02 /
Jamart-Gregoire, Brigitte 9, rue des Malines F-54500 Vandoeuvre les Nancy / FR | 03 /
Caubere, Catherine 87, rue de Metz Bâtiment C., F-54000 Nancy / FR | 04 /
Bizot-Espiard, Jean-Guy 190, rue de Vaugirard F-75015 Paris / FR | 05 /
Renard, Pierre 50, avenue de Villeneuve l'Etang F-78000 Versailles / FR | 06 /
Adam, Gérard 9, Clos du Mesnil, Route du Pecq F-78600 Le Mesnil le Roi / FR | [1994/46] | Application number, filing date | 94401050.3 | 11.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | FR19930005686 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305686 | [1994/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624575 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/42, A61K31/40 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
C07D209/42 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | Substituierte Indole und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1994/46] | English: | Substituted indoles and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1994/46] | French: | Indoles substitués et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 03.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH09325131 [ ] (JAPAN STEEL & TUBE CONSTR) | [X] - SHIBAYAMA, KATSUHIRO ET AL., "Preparation of piperazine or piperidine group-containing indoles and their uses as anti-inflammatory, antiallergy, and anti-PAF agents.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930719), vol. 119, no. 3, Database accession no. 28161c [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * |