EP0631093 - Combustion chamber with a gas separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alary, Jean-Paul Daniel 51, rue ledru Rollin F-94100 Saint Maur les Fosses / FR | 02 /
Desaulty, Michel André Albert 2, rue de la Pierre Décollée F-77240 Vert Saint Denis / FR | 03 /
Pieussergues, Christophe 3, rue de la Convention F-77370 Nangis / FR | 04 /
Sandelis, Denis Jean Maurice 1A Dubois F-77370 Nangis / FR | 05 /
Schroer, Pierre Marie Victor Emile 14, Allée des Daims F-91800 Brunoy / FR | [1994/52] | Application number, filing date | 94401211.1 | 02.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | FR19930006634 | 03.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9306634 | [1994/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631093 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631093 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
F23R3/04 (EP,US);
F23R3/34 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/52] | Title | German: | Brennkammer mit Gasabscheider | [1994/52] | English: | Combustion chamber with a gas separator | [1994/52] | French: | Chambre de combustion comprenant un ensemble séparateur de gaz | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DPA]EP0564170 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DPA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0488557 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 19 - column 9, line 6; figures 2-6 *; | [A]EP0491478 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1; | [A]GB2003554 (SNECMA); | [A]CH260957 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]GB2010408 (GEN ELECTRIC) |