EP0630805 - Floating stretcher, especially for the rescue of injured persons at sea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daouk, Antar 27, avenue du Maréchal Lyautey F-75016 Paris / FR | [1994/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Chameroy, Claude, et al Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Chameroy, Claude, et al c/o Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401369.7 | 17.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | FR19930007484 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307484 | [1994/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630805 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630805 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B63C9/04, A61G1/00 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
A61G1/013 (EP,US);
A61G1/00 (EP,US);
B63C9/04 (EP,US);
A61G2220/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Schwimmende Krankentrage, insbesondere zur Rettung Veletzter auf See | [1994/52] | English: | Floating stretcher, especially for the rescue of injured persons at sea | [1994/52] | French: | Civière flottante, destinée notamment à la récupération des blessés en mer | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB103773 (BINNIE ALEXANDER [NZ]) [Y] 4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]CH182831 (PFEIFFER CASPAR [CH]) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [YA]US3886606 (BRADFORD JOHN GUYTHAR) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-12 * column W * [A] 3; | [Y]GB1430597 (BELL P M) [Y] 8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4060079 (REINHOLD JR HERBERT E) [A] 7 * column W *; | [Y]GB2041764 (HARRIS P) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 8 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [YA]CA1118819 (WEIR ROY) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-12 * page 13, line 33 - page 14, line 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 5; | [A]US4347635 (EISENHAUER LEIGH E) [A] 1* abstract * |