EP0631357 - Tubular support for mounting an elastic shrinkable sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROMOLD 19-21, rue Capouillet B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | [1994/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crepel, Denis c/o Euromold 3ème Zone Industr. B-9440 Erembodegem / BE | 02 /
Cardinaels, Jozef Reinaertlaan 30 B-9080 Lochristi / BE | [1997/32] |
Former [1994/52] | 01 /
Crepel, Denis c/o Euromold 3èMe Zone Industr. B-9440 Erembodegem / BE | ||
02 /
Cardinaels, Jozef Reinaertlaan 30 B-9080 Lochristi / BE | Representative(s) | Buffiere, Michelle Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Buffiere, Michelle SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401381.2 | 20.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | FR19930007774 | 25.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307774 | [1994/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631357 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631357 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/14, H02G15/18 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
H02G15/1826 (EP,US);
H02G1/14 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53657 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Rohrförmiger Träger zum Montieren einer elastischen schrumpfbaren Hülse | [1994/52] | English: | Tubular support for mounting an elastic shrinkable sleeve | [1994/52] | French: | Support tubulaire de pose d'un manchon élastique rétractable | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2592825 (ARTEMA [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4506430 (GUZAY JR CASIMIR M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE961447 (WILHELM HAERDTLE) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |