EP0688728 - Piled paper sheets dispenser housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Desmarescaux, Bertrand 7, rue Clovis Chezel F-51100 Reims / FR | [1995/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401421.6 | 23.06.1994 | [1995/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688728 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/08, B65D5/42, B42F7/10 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B42F7/14 (EP);
B65D83/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/52] | Title | German: | Spendergehäuse von einem Stapel Papierblätter | [1995/52] | English: | Piled paper sheets dispenser housing | [1995/52] | French: | Boîtier distributeur de feuilles de papier en pile | [1995/52] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE7629553U (RUDAT) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE1865115U (ZEITSPAR-REIN) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE8137960U (KRAUTTER) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US3750930 (ROTH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0046548 (HENKEL) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR1436701 (PARIDOC) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * |