EP0636850 - Mine-clearing system, in particular for pressure-plate type land mines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière F-78034 Versailles Cédex / FR | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amberny, Philippe 4, route des Sauges F-18390 Savigny en Septaine / FR | 02 /
Zelverte, Joel 10, clos des Sentiers F-18570 La Chapelle Saint Ursin / FR | [1995/05] | Application number, filing date | 94401468.7 | 28.06.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | FR19930009412 | 30.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309412 | [1995/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636850 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F41H11/16 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
F41H11/30 (EP,US);
F41H11/28 (EP,US);
F41H11/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Minenraumsystem, insbesondere für Landminen mit Druckplatten | [1995/05] | English: | Mine-clearing system, in particular for pressure-plate type land mines | [1995/05] | French: | Système de déminage, en particulier pour des mines du surface du type à plateau de pression | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3837259 (VAUGHN D) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5183119 (WATTENBURG WILLARD H [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 1 - column 5, line 54; figure - *; | [A]US4593766 (GOSSARD GORDON G [US]) [A] 7 * column 3, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US2442390 (WILLIAMS ALLISON R) [A] 1-3 * column W * |