EP0634312 - Device for mounting a steering column on the rest of a structure of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE F-25400 Audincourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE F-25400 Audincourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouhot, Frédéric 1 bis, rue du Souvenir Français F-25420 Voujeaucourt / FR | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401543.7 | 05.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | FR19930008775 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9308775 | [1995/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634312 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634312 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16, F16L3/14 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B62D1/16 (EP);
F16L3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Lenksäule am Rest der Struktur eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1995/03] | English: | Device for mounting a steering column on the rest of a structure of a motor vehicle | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un ensemble de colonne de direction sur le reste de la structure d'un véhicule automobile | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.04.1997 | NL | 09.04.1997 | PT | 09.07.1997 | SE | 09.07.1997 | BE | 31.07.1997 | CH | 31.07.1997 | LI | 31.07.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/46] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
BE | 31.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0270311 (FORD FRANCE SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, column 2, line 3 - page 3, column 3, line 13; figure - *; | [A]EP0444996 (ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE) [A] 1,3 * page 3, column 3, line 1 - page 4, column 3, line 51; figure - *; | [D]FR2658775 (ECIA - EPUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE); | [A]GB1292256 (FORT MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1-3 * page 1, column R, line 49 - line 91; figure 1 * |