EP0634344 - Dual compartment container for collecting waste, in particular domestic refuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret F-69003 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serrault, Jean-Pierre 27, Place Henri Neveu F-92700 Colombes / FR | 02 /
Semeillon, Jean-Claude 3, Sente des Vergers F-78240 Chambourcy / FR | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401605.4 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | FR19930008606 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9308606 | [1995/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634344 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634344 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/16 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B65F1/004 (EP);
B65F1/1615 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Doppelkammer-Behälter zum Sammeln von Abfällen, insbesondere Hausmüll | [1995/03] | English: | Dual compartment container for collecting waste, in particular domestic refuse | [1995/03] | French: | Conteneur compartimenté pour la collecte de déchets, notamment d'ordures ménagères | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 02.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9013881U (M. HOFFEND ET AL.) [A] 1 * page 18, line 21 - page 19, line 18 * * figures 4,5,8 *; | [A]WO9301111 (C. HICKEY) [A] 1 * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 19 * * figures 5,7,8 * |