EP0636766 - Turbomachine with variable guide vanes and actuator ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charbonnel, Jean-Louis 20, rue de Beaune F-77310 Boississe Le Roi / FR | 02 /
Guerout, Philippe 28, rue du Général Salomon F-77770 Chartrettes / FR | 03 /
Happey, Jacques Lucien 27, Les Chaumières F-77950 Voisenon / FR | 04 /
Mainfroy, Frédéric 25, allée des cyclamens F-91100 Corbeil Essonnes / FR | 05 /
Naudet, Jacky 8, rue des Perdrix F-91070 Bondoufle / FR | 06 /
Porcher, Jean-Claude 12, bld Aristide Briand F-77220 Gretz-Armainvilliers / FR | [1995/05] | Application number, filing date | 94401719.3 | 27.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | FR19930009266 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309266 | [1995/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636766 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636766 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/16 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
F01D17/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/05] | Title | German: | Turbomaschinenstator mit verstellbaren Leitschaufeln und deren Bedienungsring | [1995/05] | English: | Turbomachine with variable guide vanes and actuator ring | [1995/05] | French: | Stator de turbomachine à aubes pivotantes et anneau de commande | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE623280 (LICENTIA) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2862687 (EMILE AGUET, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE1136350 (ENTWICKLUNGSBAU PIRNA VEB) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1466613 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]GB1505858 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]FR2583820 (SNECMA [FR]) [XY] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4755104 (CASTRO JOAQUIN H [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * en pariculier fig. 2; column W *; | [AD]GB2254381 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US5158430 (DIXON WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column W * |