blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0636464

EP0636464 - Method for bounded incorporation of a decoration in a thermoplastic substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EUROSTYLE (S.A.)
4, rue des Petits Ruisseaux, Z.A. des Godets
F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR
[1995/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Boulbon, Jack
17, chemin de Montbain
F-36130 Deols / FR
[1995/05]
Representative(s)Viard, Jean
Cabinet Madeuf-Viard 56A, Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/05]Viard, Jean
Cabinet VIARD 28 bis, avenue Mozart
F-75016 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94401735.928.07.1994
[1995/05]
Priority number, dateFR1993000939930.07.1993         Original published format: FR 9309399
[1995/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0636464
Date:01.02.1995
Language:FR
[1995/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0636464
Date:01.03.2000
Language:FR
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/14, B29C45/16
[1995/05]
CPC:
B29C45/1671 (EP); B29C45/14336 (EP); B29C45/14795 (EP);
B29C2045/14188 (EP); B29C2045/14901 (EP); B29C2045/14983 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum begrenzten Einfügen eines Dekors in einem thermoplastischen Substrat[1995/05]
English:Method for bounded incorporation of a decoration in a thermoplastic substrate[1995/05]
French:Procédé d'insertion délimitée d'un décor dans un support thermoplastique[1995/05]
Examination procedure18.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/37]
17.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1999Fee for grant paid
25.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
MC31.07.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2002/42]AT01.03.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2001/08]AT01.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[DX]FR1360514  (CYRIL ASTOR PHOTOMATON LONDON) [DX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DX]US4130622  (PAWLAK KENNETH E) [DX] 1,3 * column W *;
 [A]GB2171048  (METAL BOX PLC) [A] 2* page 3, line 2 - line 15; figures 3,4 *;
 [DXY]EP0332899  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [DX] 1 * column 5, line 30 - line 42; figure - * [DY] 4;
 [DX]EP0448876  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0517615  (ALLIBERT SA [FR]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.