EP0656375 - Additive for the reduction of mottle in photothermographic and thermographic elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonkoski, Roger K., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufac. Company, 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Savu, Patricia M., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401831.6 | 09.08.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | US19930104888 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: US 104888 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656375 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656375 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/18, C08F220/22, C08F220/24, G03C1/498, B41M5/32, // (C08F214/18, 220:20, 220:02) | [1995/23] | CPC: |
G03C1/4989 (EP,US);
G03C1/49863 (EP,US);
G03C1/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/23] | Title | German: | Hilfsmittel zur Verringerung der Fleckenbildung in photothermographischen und thermographischen Elementen | [1995/23] | English: | Additive for the reduction of mottle in photothermographic and thermographic elements | [1995/23] | French: | Additif limitant la formation de tâches les éléments photothermographiques et thermographiques | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.10.1998 | [1999/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5061769 (AHARONI SHAUL M [US]) [X] 1-4 * See example 1 * [A] 5-23; | [XA]EP0182516 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * See Table 2, example 15 on page 30 * [A] 5-23; | [DXDA]JPH01223168 | [DXA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 42, Database accession no. 89-303794, & JPH01223168 A 19890906 (TORAY IND. INC.) [DX] 1-4 [DA] 5-23 | Examination | EP0408917 |