EP0644007 - Process and device for measuring railway wheels before reprofiling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORD PRODUCTIQUE société anonyme Zone Industrielle de Saint laurent F-46400 Saint Cere / FR | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pioch, Michel Les Bories F-46400 Saint Cere / FR | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1995/34] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/28] | Bernasconi, Jean Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/12] | Bernasconi, Jean c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402031.2 | 13.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | FR19930011266 | 22.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311266 | [1995/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644007 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23B5/28 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
B23B5/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung von Eisenbahnrädern vor der Reprofilierung | [1995/12] | English: | Process and device for measuring railway wheels before reprofiling | [1995/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositifs de mesure de roues de chemin de fer avant reprofilage | [1995/12] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/47] | 19.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0456845 (W. HEGENSCHEIDT G.M.B.H.) [A] 1,16 * figure -; claim - * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 52 *; | [A]GB2069142 (MC MURTRY) [A] 1,16,17 * page 2, line 93 - line 123 * * figures 1,2,4; claim - *; | [A]EP0072687 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 1,16,17 * abstract * * page 12, line 20 - line 34 * * page 32, line 17 - page 35, line 25 * * figures 1,8-15 *; | [A]GB2177205 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 1,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2163850 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 1,16,17 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5B * * page 2, line 115 - line 123 * * claim - * |