EP0703396 - Threaded joint for oil well pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 540 / JP | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Miyuki 1-2-32-206 Asahigaoka Ikeda-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Nagasaku, Shigeo 5-8-205 Tendou-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Schrimpf, Robert Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402132.8 | 23.09.1994 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703396 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703396 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/06 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
E21B17/042 (EP,US);
F16L15/004 (EP,US);
F16L15/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/13] | Title | German: | Schraubverbindung für Ölförderrohre | [1996/13] | English: | Threaded joint for oil well pipes | [1996/13] | French: | Raccord à vis pour tuyaux de l'extraction du pétrole | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 10.12.1996 | Observations by third parties | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4384737 (REUSSER HANS E) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP0273016 (DALMINE SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * figure 2; claim 4 *; | [A]DE8707965U (DALMINE) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO9318329 (MARUBENI TUBULARS INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * figures 1A,6C; claim 28 *; | [A]WO9102185 (ADVANCED THREAD SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * page 43, line 1 - line 13; figures 10-12 * | Examination | US4830411 | other | US4830411 |