EP0651203 - Radiant gas burner for stove or cooker hob [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUTAGAZ 45-49, rue de Villiers F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1995/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Strat, Georges F-76760 Saint-Martin-aux-Arbres / FR | 02 /
Lefebvre, Michel 47 rue du Cours Appartement 33 F-76300 Sotteville les Rouen / FR | 03 /
Moser, Michel Résidence Le Marigny, 87 Rue Cauchoise F-76000 Rouen / FR | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402191.4 | 30.09.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | FR19930011670 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311670 | [1995/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651203 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651203 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/78, F23D14/16, F24C3/06 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
F23D14/78 (EP);
F23D14/16 (EP);
F24C3/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Gas-Strahlungsbrenner für Herd oder Kochmulde | [1995/18] | English: | Radiant gas burner for stove or cooker hob | [1995/18] | French: | Brûleur radiant à gaz pour cuisinière ou table de cuisson | [1997/18] |
Former [1995/18] | Bruleur radiant à gaz pour cuisinière ou table de cuisson | Examination procedure | 04.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.02.1998 | ES | 04.02.1998 | GB | 04.02.1998 | GR | 04.02.1998 | IT | 04.02.1998 | NL | 04.02.1998 | DK | 04.05.1998 | PT | 04.05.1998 | SE | 04.05.1998 | DE | 05.05.1998 | IE | 24.09.1998 | BE | 30.09.1998 | CH | 30.09.1998 | LI | 30.09.1998 | LU | 30.09.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
ES | 04.02.1998 | ||
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
GR | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
NL | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
ES | 04.02.1998 | ||
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
GR | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
GR | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
GR | 04.02.1998 | ||
IE | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
GR | 04.02.1998 | ||
IE | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
IE | 04.02.1998 | ||
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
IE | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
IE | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
GB | 04.02.1998 | ||
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
PT | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | AT | 04.02.1998 | |
DE | 05.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 04.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1433771 (PARKINSON COWAN APPLIANCES LTD); | [A]WO8404376 (SLYMAN MFG CORP [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 13; figures 3,4 *; | [DA]EP0157432 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1,10 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]WO9206334 (DIETRICH EQUIP MENAGER [FR], et al) [DA] 1,5-7,10 * page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 14; figures 4,5 * |