EP0651502 - Amplifier element with current mode diffential structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states ALCATEL MOBILE COMMUNICATION FRANCE 10, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genest, Pierre 8, Rue A. Renoir F-95430 Butry Sur Oise / FR | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402432.2 | 27.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | FR19930013000 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: FR 9313000 | [1995/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651502 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651502 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
H03F3/45273 (EP,US);
H03F3/45179 (EP,US);
H03F3/45183 (EP,US);
H03F3/45708 (EP,US);
H03F3/45717 (EP,US);
H03F2200/91 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45072 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45078 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45182 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45466 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45476 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45571 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Verstärkerelement mit Differenzstruktur in Strombetriebsart | [1995/18] | English: | Amplifier element with current mode diffential structure | [1995/18] | French: | Elément d'amplification à structure différentielle en mode de courant | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.11.1999 | NL | 24.11.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 24.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5132640 (TANAKA TATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,8-13 * column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 37; figures 3-6 * [A] 2; | [Y]US3867685 (AHMED ADEL ABDEL AZIZ) [Y] 1,8-13 * column 7, line 12 - column 9, line 5; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0534007 (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]GB2010038 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 2-15 * page 2, line 53 - page 4, line 60; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4757273 (BRAY DEREK [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 11; figure 11 * | [Y] - E. SEEVINCK, "DESIGN AND APPLICATION OF INTEGRATED ANALOG INTERFACE CIRCUITS", 1988 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS PROCEEDINGS, FINLAND, (19880607), vol. 2, pages 1923 - 1926, XP000092213 [Y] 1,8-13 * page 1924, column R, line 46 - page 1925, column L, line 16; figures 8,9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1988.15314 |