EP0654954 - Method and apparatus for volume and intelligibility control for a loudspeaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. P.O. Box 13969, 1 Triangle Drive Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US | [1996/10] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. One Triangle Drive, Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. P.O. Box 13969, 1 Triangle Drive Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasmusson, Jim Agne Jerher 8321 Hempshire Place Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402558.4 | 14.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | US19930157964 | 24.11.1993 Original published format: US 157964 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654954 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654954 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00, H04M1/60 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
H04R3/04 (EP,US);
G10L21/0364 (EP,US);
H04M1/6016 (EP,US);
H04M1/6041 (EP,US);
H04M1/6075 (EP,US);
H04R3/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Lautstärke- und Verständlichkeitsregelung für einen Lautsprecher | [1995/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for volume and intelligibility control for a loudspeaker | [1995/21] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le contrôle du volume et de l'intelligibilité d'un haut-parleur | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4490691 (DOLBY RAY M [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 6 - column 1048; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4721923 (BARES JAROMIR R [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 27 *; | [A]EP0290952 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * claim - *; | [X]DE3837538 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 26; figures 2,10-12 *; | [A]US5115471 (LIDEN GARY [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 41 *; | [A]EP0505645 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 10 - line 30 ** page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 31; figure - *; | [X]US5170435 (ROSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 20; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9318626 (BANG & OLUFSEN AS [DK]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 20; figure 2 * |