EP0656252 - Process for manufacturing a material, laminated with a reinforced film, having a low coefficient of friction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2000/14] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret F-69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartocci, Marcel Balesmes F-52200 Langes / FR | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402614.5 | 17.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | FR19930013793 | 18.11.1993 Original published format: FR 9313793 | [1995/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656252 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656252 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/24, B32B15/08 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
F16C33/28 (EP,US);
B32B2307/746 (US);
B32B2327/18 (US);
B32B2605/08 (US);
Y10T29/302 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49636 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49906 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer mit verstärktem Film beschichtetem Materials mit kleinem Reibungskoeffizienten | [1995/23] | English: | Process for manufacturing a material, laminated with a reinforced film, having a low coefficient of friction | [1995/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau de revêtement en feuille, renforcé, à faible coefficient de frottement | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3607594 (MANCEL RAYMOND) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 31 - line 48; figure .; claims 1,3-6 *; | [XY]FR2445210 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 20; claims 1,5 * [Y] 3; | [X]EP0040448 (SCHMIDT GMBH KARL [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 7; figure 3; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3304141 (PAMPUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 10; figures 1,3; claims 1,3 *; | [A]DE3922052 (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 3* the whole document * |