EP0662318 - Cosmetic and/or dermatological composition containing salicylic acid derivatives and the solubilisation process of these derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griat, Jacqueline 11, Quai de la Baronnie F-94480 Ablon / FR | 02 /
Picard, Elisabeth 2, Rue Marcel Doret F-78140 Velizy / FR | 03 /
Laugier, Jean-Pierre 1, Voie Verte F-92160 Antony / FR | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Lhoste, Catherine L'OREAL, 90 rue du Général Roguet F-92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402692.1 | 24.11.1994 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | FR19940000175 | 10.01.1994 Original published format: FR 9400175 | [1995/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662318 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662318 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K31/60 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Kosmetische und/oder dermatologische Zusammensetzung enthaltend Salicylsäurederivate sowie ihren Verfahren zum Auflösen | [1995/28] | English: | Cosmetic and/or dermatological composition containing salicylic acid derivatives and the solubilisation process of these derivatives | [1995/28] | French: | Composition cosmétique et/ou dermatologique contenant des dérivés d'acide salicylique et procédé de solubilisation de ces dérivés | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 20.11.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.11.1996 | [1998/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]GB2174906 (OREAL) [DY] 1,3,9,17 * example 2 *; | [DA]EP0378936 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 9-20* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0570230 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-11,14-17,19 * exemples 27,28,31,42,43 * * exemples 27,28,31,42,43 * [Y] 1,3,9,17 |