EP0655214 - Filter folder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Krups GmbH & Co. KG Heresbachstrasse 29 42719 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Robert Krups GmbH & Co. KG Heresbachstrasse 29 42719 Solingen / DE | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states Robert Krups GmbH & Co. KG Heresbachstrasse 29 D-42719 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pytlik, Dorothea Tiefendik 3 D-42719 Solingen / DE | 02 /
Borgmann, Michael Dültgenstaler Strasse 14 D-42719 Solingen / DE | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Busquets, Jean-Pierre SAS Groupe SEB Moulinex Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue du Colonel Rémy 14054 Caen Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Busquets, Jean-Pierre Société Moulinex 11, rue Jules Ferry F-93170 Bagnolet / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402715.0 | 29.11.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | FR19930014308 | 30.11.1993 Original published format: FR 9314308 | [1995/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655214 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655214 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
A47J31/0663 (EP,US);
A47J31/0621 (EP,US);
A47J31/4496 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | Filterträger | [1995/22] | English: | Filter folder | [1995/22] | French: | Porte-filtre | [1995/22] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.03.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   19.04.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.10.1997 | GR | 08.10.1997 | SE | 08.01.1998 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/30] | DK | 08.10.1997 | |
SE | 08.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 08.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE422708 (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | [A]FR546116 (GARDINER) [A] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2187187 (EMANUEL WEINBERGER) [Y] 3-7 * page 2, column L, line 13 - line 44; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]FR2454784 (MAXS AG [CH]); | [YA]DE8110818U (STREICHER EMIDE METALL [DE]) [Y] 2 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 * [A] 1; | [A]LU85480 (MACH MARKETING HOLDING COMPANY [LU]) [A] 1,4-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0388975 (PATZNER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP0515245 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 48; figure - *; | [XY]DE4129814 (SAEZ DANIEL SOLER [ES]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 * [Y] 2-7 |