EP0656526 - Device for the detection of the angular position of an internal combustion engine camshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT 34, Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT 34, Quai du Point du Jour F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leclerc, Marc 1, rue Marcel Sembat F-93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Fernandez, Francis Lionel, et al Renault Technocentre S.0267 - TCR AVA 0-56 1 avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Fernandez, Francis Lionel, et al Régie Nationale des Usines Renault SA Service 0267 - Bâtiment J2 860, Quai de Stalingrad B.P. 103 F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402762.2 | 02.12.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | FR19930014509 | 03.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9314509 | [1995/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656526 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14, F02P7/06, F02B77/08, F01L1/46 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
G01D5/147 (EP);
F01L1/46 (EP);
F02B77/087 (EP);
F02F7/006 (EP);
F02P7/067 (EP);
F01L2820/041 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1995/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Winkellage einer Nockenwelle einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/23] | English: | Device for the detection of the angular position of an internal combustion engine camshaft | [1995/23] | French: | Dispositif de détection de la position angulaire d'un arbre à cames de moteur à combustion interne | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/02] | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0516493 (SAGEM ALLUMAGE) [A] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 43 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5126663 (SHINJO) [A] 1 * column 2, line 23 - line 49 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1,2,4 * |