EP0657321 - High availability multi-current supply system for a locomotive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kleber 75016 Paris / FR | [1998/05] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kleber F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thevenon, Alain 108, rue Pierre Brunier F-69300 Caluire / FR | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Fournier, Michel, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Fournier, Michel, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402836.4 | 09.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | FR19930014923 | 13.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9314923 | [1995/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657321 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657321 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60L9/30 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B60L9/30 (EP,US);
H02M1/088 (KR);
B60L3/0023 (EP,US);
H02M1/00 (KR);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2210/12 (EP,US);
B60L2210/14 (EP,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Mehrfachstromversorgungssystem mit hoher Verfügbarkeit für eine Lokomotive | [1995/24] | English: | High availability multi-current supply system for a locomotive | [1995/24] | French: | Système d'alimentation multicourant à haute disponibilité pour engin de locomotive ferroviaire | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0383971 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]EP0514580 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [DA] - G. WIEGNER, "GTO-STROMRICHTER FÜR BAHNEN", ZEV GLASERS ANNALEN, DE, (198907), vol. 113, no. 6/7, pages 259 - 272 [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * |