EP0658447 - Process for manufacturing decorative products using reproductions of graphic representations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLOO INDUSTRIE RN 124 F-40990 Mees / FR | [1995/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remazeilles, Jean-Michel Résidence Rubens, 14 Avenue Sablar F-40100 Dax / FR | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402873.7 | 13.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | FR19930015185 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315185 | [1995/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658447 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B44F11/02, B44C3/04, B44C5/04 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
B44C5/0461 (EP);
B44C3/042 (EP);
B44C5/0446 (EP);
B44C5/0453 (EP);
B44F11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von dekorativen Produkten unter Verwendung von Nachbildungen von Graphiken | [1995/25] | English: | Process for manufacturing decorative products using reproductions of graphic representations | [1995/25] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication des produits décoratifs utilisant des reproductions d'oeuvres graphiques | [1995/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 11.03.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3287193 (M. KLEIN) [DX] 1-4,6,9-12,19 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 7 *; | [DX]GB1572324 (R. M. KING) [DX] 1,3,4,6,11-13,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2909805 (W. JAMES) [A] 1,3,4,11,19 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 55 *; | [A]EP0392098 (ESSTRA INDUSTRIES CORP.) [A] 1,2,6,18,19 * page 2, line 41 - page 4, line 20 * |