EP0669470 - Universal holding device, in particular for the fastening of electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1995/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre 41, Avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78800 Houilles / FR | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402888.5 | 14.12.1994 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | FR19940001028 | 31.01.1994 Original published format: FR 9401028 | [1995/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669470 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669470 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/24, H02G3/10 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
F16B2/245 (EP);
H02G3/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/35] | Title | German: | Universelle Halterung, insbesondere für die Befestigung einer elektrischen Ausrüstung | [1995/35] | English: | Universal holding device, in particular for the fastening of electrical equipment | [1995/35] | French: | Attache universelle en particulier pour la fixation d'un équipement électrique | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1999/01] | DE | 23.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB833125 (F. T. PRODUCTS LIMITED) [A] 1,2,7 * page 1, line 51 - page 2, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR1428487 (TINNERMAN III) [A] 1-4,7 * page 2, column L, line 44 - page 3, column R, line 31; figures 1-8 * |