EP0661720 - Use of a method for coating by semi-transfered arc for the protection of a heterogenous zone of a nuclear component and a coating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/27] | Method and device for manufacturing a sealing protective layer on a surface of a nuclear reactor component, and applications | ||
[1997/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cartry, Jean-Pierre 17 rue Saint Antoine F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94403011.3 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | FR19930015931 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315931 | [1995/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661720 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661720 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/036, G21C17/017, B23K15/00 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G21C17/017 (EP,US);
B23K15/0086 (EP,US);
G21C13/036 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, LI, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Anwendung eines Verfahrens zur Herstellung eines Überzugs durch einen halb-übertragenen Lichtbogen zum Schutz einer heterogenen Zone eines Kernreaktors-Bauteils und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1997/17] | English: | Use of a method for coating by semi-transfered arc for the protection of a heterogenous zone of a nuclear component and a coating device | [1997/17] | French: | Utilisation d'un procédé de réalisation d'un revêtement par arc semi-transféré pour la protection d'une zone hétérogène d'un composant nucléaire et dispositif de revêtement | [1997/17] |
Former [1995/27] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer dichten Schutzschicht auf einer Fläche eines Kernreaktorsbestandteils und Anwendungen | ||
Former [1995/27] | Method and device for manufacturing a sealing protective layer on a surface of a nuclear reactor component, and applications | ||
Former [1995/27] | Procédé et dispositif de réalisation d'un revêtement protecteur étanche sur une surface d'un composant de réacteur nucléaire et applications | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.04.1997 | SE | 23.07.1997 | DE | 24.07.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/12] | SE | 23.07.1997 | |
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | DE | 24.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD136114 ; | [Y]FR2186851 (UNION CARBIDE UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 12 * * page 3, line 4 - line 27 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 1 * * page 10, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]US3921440 (TOTH ENDRE LESLIE) [A] 9 * column 1, line 36 - line 51 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 5 * * figure 2 *; | [YA]FR2495734 (FRAMATOME SA [FR], et al) [Y] 3,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 21 * * page 2, line 14 - line 36 * * figure 1 * [A] 10,11; | [DY]FR2509640 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) [DY] 1-5,8 * page 4, line 7 - line 35 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 3 * * claim 2 *; | [A]US4440339 (TAMAI YASUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 10,11 * column 3, line 52 - line 64 * * figure 7 *; | [A]FR2558767 (CLEXTRAL [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 24 - line 29 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 17 - line 37 * * claim 4 *; | [A]US4672852 (GUGEL GEORG [DE], et al); | [Y]US4716572 (KUEHN HEINRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 28 - line 31 * * column 2, line 24 - line 34 * * column 2, line 50 - line 68 * * column 3, line 51 - line 54 *; | [A]US5274683 (BRODA PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 4,7 * column 2, line 36 - line 47 * | [A] - FARCY ET AL., "Cinétique d'endommagement en fatigue thermique d'un alliage base cobalt", MEMOIRES ET ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, PARIS FR, vol. 84, page 107 [A] 1 * page 107, column R, paragraphs 1-2; table 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 33, Database accession no. 79-59957B, & DD136114 A 19790620 (SKODA) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * |