EP0636387 - Process of calibration and standardization of a radiometer to measure temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SADIS BRUKER SPECTROSPIN, SOCIETE ANONYME DE DIFFUSION DE L'INSTRUMENTATION SCIENTIFIQUE BRUKER SPECTROSPIN (S.A. à Direct.) 34, rue de l'Industrie 67160 Wissembourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states SADIS BRUKER SPECTROSPIN, SOCIETE ANONYME DE DIFFUSION DE L'INSTRUMENTATION SCIENTIFIQUE BRUKER SPECTROSPIN (S.A. à Direct.) 34, rue de l'Industrie F-67160 Wissembourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mabire, Jean-Pierre 1 rue Geyher F-67500 Haguenau / FR | 02 /
Ringeisen, Victor 33 rue de la Laiterie F-67160 Riedseltz / FR | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Nuss, Pierre, et al 10, rue Jacques Kablé F-67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94440049.8 | 28.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | FR19930009525 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309525 | [1995/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636387 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/00, A61N5/02 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
A61N5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1995/05] | Title | German: | Eich- und Standardisationsverfahren eines Radiometers für die Messung von Temperaturen | [1995/05] | English: | Process of calibration and standardization of a radiometer to measure temperatures | [1995/05] | French: | Procédé de calibration et d'étalonnage d'un radiomètre pour la mesure de températures | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 01.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/31] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2679455 (INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE) [X] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 21, line 16; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]WO9207622 (BSD MEDICAL CORPORATION) [Y] 2,3 * page 17, line 34 - page 27, line 14; figures 1-4 * [A] 1; | [A]GB2000335 (RCA CORP.) [A] 1 * page 1, line 113 - page 2, line 76; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8803823 (BSD MEDICAL CORPORATION) [A] 1 *abrégé * * figure 1 * |