EP0622749 - Neural network system for signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/44] | Neural network system for signal processing, especially for image analysis and synthesis | ||
[1998/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE 10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public, 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane 75015 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public, 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leray, Pascal 27 l'Etang de la Motte F-35590 Saint-Gilles / FR | 02 /
Burnod, Yves 22 Villa Moderne F-94110 Arcueil / FR | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 4 rue Général Hoche 56100 Lorient / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 4 rue Général Hoche F-56100 Lorient / FR | Application number, filing date | 94460012.1 | 28.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | FR19930005266 | 29.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9305266 | [1994/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622749 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622749 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G06N3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Neuronales Netzwerk für Signalverarbeitung | [1998/47] | English: | Neural network system for signal processing | [1998/47] | French: | Système à réseau neuronal pour le traitement de signaux | [1998/47] |
Former [1994/44] | Neuronales Netzwerk für Signalverarbeitung besonders für Bildanalyse und -synthese | ||
Former [1994/44] | Neural network system for signal processing, especially for image analysis and synthesis | ||
Former [1994/44] | Système à réseau neuronal pour le traitement de signaux, notamment pour l'analyse et la synthèse d'images | Examination procedure | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4858177 (SMITH HARRY F [US]) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 13, line 44 - line 61; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5204938 (SKAPURA DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure 3 * | [YA] - TRELEAVEN, "Towards a general-purpose neurocomputing system", COMPEURO 91, BOLOGNA , ITALY, (19910513), doi:doi:10.1109/CMPEUR.1991.257406, pages 331 - 335, XP010022883 [Y] 1,2 * page 333, column L, line 1 - page 335, column L, line 16; figures 5,6 * [A] 3-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMPEUR.1991.257406 | [Y] - WOJCIECHOWSKI, "SNAP : a parallel processor for implementing real time neural networks", IEEE 1991 NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE NAECON 1991, DAYTON , USA, (19910520), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/NAECON.1991.165834, pages 736 - 742, XP010048217 [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NAECON.1991.165834 | [A] - JUMP, "A massively parallel, multiple-SIMD architecture for implementing artificial neural networks", 1992 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, CHICAGO , USA, (19921018), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/ICSMC.1992.271809, pages 13 - 18, XP010065271 [A] 1,2 * page 14, column L, line 16 - page 15, column R, line 35; figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1992.271809 |