EP0622148 - Resistance welding current control method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLLAC S.A. Immeuble Elysées-la-Défense, 29, Le Parvis 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states SOLLAC S.A. Immeuble Elysées-la-Défense, 29, Le Parvis F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brach, Jean-Luc 63bis, rue Principale F-57330 Entrange / FR | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION Domaine de l'IRSID Immeuble Pacific 11-13, cours Valmy La Défense 7 - TSA 10001 92070 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION Domaine de l'IRSID Immeuble Pacific 11-13, cours Valmy La Défense 7 - TSA 10001 F-92070 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX / FR | Application number, filing date | 94470010.3 | 08.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | FR19930004968 | 27.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9304968 | [1994/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622148 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/25, B23K11/06 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
B23K11/257 (EP);
B23K11/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung des Widerstandschweissstroms, und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1994/44] | English: | Resistance welding current control method and apparatus | [1994/44] | French: | Procédé de régulation du courant de soudage par résistance électrique et soudeuse pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1994/44] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/02] | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0502478 (ELPATRONIC AG) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 55 - column 9, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4734556 (NAMIKI) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0019747 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 7, line 26; figures 2,3 * |