EP0748906 - Balustrade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ALUVAR S.A. 3081, Route de la Fénerie, Z.I. de Pégomas F-06580 Pégomas / FR | [1998/38] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states Costa, Alain Villa "La Felicita", 640, Boulevard Rebuffel F-06250 Mougins / FR | ||
For all designated states SOCIETE ALUVAR S.A. 3081, Route de la Fénerie, Z.I. de Pégomas F-06580 Pégomas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costa, Alain, M. Villa Felicita 640, Bld Rebuffel 06580 Mougins / FR | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Hammond, William Cabinet Hammond 87 Rue de la Saussière 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Hammond, William Cabinet Hammond 33, rue Vaneau 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94480031.7 | 20.04.1994 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | FR19930005052 | 23.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9305052 | [1996/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748906 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
E04F11/1851 (EP);
E04F11/1834 (EP);
E04F11/1842 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | Geländer | [1996/51] | English: | Balustrade | [1996/51] | French: | Garde-corps | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 02.02.1996 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 24.06.1996 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 06.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2123879 (PROFIL S ACIERS ET ALLIAGES L GERS SCARAMOZZINO FRÈRES PAAL) [DA] 1,7,8 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1440746 (N.V. HEKALU) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 5 - column R, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE1683158 (KABEL- UND METALLWERKE GUTEHOFFNUNGSHÜTTE AG) [A] 1-3,6 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 31; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2563530 (HAWKINS) [A] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 61; figures 1-12 *; | [A]FR1552218 (S.E.R.D.I.B) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 20 - column R, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2657600 (KLASSEN) [A] 1,7 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH511350 (F LIX) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-6 * |