EP0627361 - Tamper evident cover applied to a stopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORMAS TECNICAS, S.A. C. Riu, 27 08291 Ripollet / ES | [1996/31] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states Junqueras Guerre, Joaquin C. del Riu, 27 E-08291 Ripollet (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junqueres Guerre, Joaquin C. Riu, 27 08291 Ripollet / ES | [1996/31] |
Former [1994/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 E-08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 94500093.3 | 27.05.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | ES19930001179 | 31.05.1993 Original published format: ES 9301179 | [1994/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627361 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/08 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
B65D55/08 (EP,US);
B65D41/62 (EP,US);
B65D55/0854 (EP,US);
B65D2401/00 (EP,US);
B65D2401/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, PT [1994/49] | Title | German: | Die Originalität anzeigende Abdeckung für einen Verschluss | [1994/49] | English: | Tamper evident cover applied to a stopper | [1994/49] | French: | Elément de surbouchage indiquant l'originalité | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/23] | 05.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3733002 (FUJIO M) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 18 - line 64 * * column 3, line 14 - line 29; figure - * [Y] 3; | [PXA]US5292018 (TRAVISANO FRANK P [US]) [PX] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 16 * * column 4, line 41 - line 55; figure - * [A] 1; | [Y]FR1215203 (UNIPLAX SOUCHON NEUVESEL) [Y] 3 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 11 * * page 1, column R, line 16 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]US4538740 (PETERSEN JR BENJAMIN R [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [A]DE8703636U (SCHWARTAUER) [A] 1,3,4 * figure -; claims 1,4,5 * |