EP0692451 - A stable and active nickel catalyst for carbon dioxide reforming of methane to synthesis gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Zhaolong Nan-Hua Road, Bei-Cun 7/101 Xiamen 361005 / CN | For all designated states Verykios, Xenophon E. Kilkis 7 Agios Basilios Patras / GR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states Zhang, Zhaolong Nan-Hua Road, Bei-Cun 7/101 Xiamen 361005 / CN | ||
For all designated states Verykios, Xenophon E. Kilkis 7 Agios Basilios, Patras / GR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Argyriadis, Korinna Argyriadis - Metallinos - Schinas, 14, Sina Street 106 72 Athens / GR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Argyriadis, Korinna Argyriadis - Metallinos - Schinas, 14, Sina Street GR-106 72 Athens / GR | Application number, filing date | 94600005.6 | 13.07.1994 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692451 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692451 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/00, C01B3/40 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
B01J23/83 (EP);
C01B3/40 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/19] |
Former [1996/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein stabiler und aktiver Nickelkatalysator für die Kohlendioxydreformierung von Methan zum Synthesegas | [1996/03] | English: | A stable and active nickel catalyst for carbon dioxide reforming of methane to synthesis gas | [1996/03] | French: | Un catalyseur au nickel stable et actif pour le réformage au dioxyde de carbone de méthane pour obtenir du gaz de synthèse | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.2000 | GR | 17.05.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2001/11] | BE | 17.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1072221 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 37 *; | [A]DE1792795 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - line 27 *; | [AD]EP0084273 (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]) [AD] 1* page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 19 * | [A] - WU QIEYI ET AL, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930222), vol. 118, no. 8, Database accession no. 62544u [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - TIANRANQI HUAGONG, (1991), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 3 - 8 |