Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0639419
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.11.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
19.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] |
20.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.02.1998 |
First examination report |
|
18.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.09.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.1995 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] |
09.08.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] |
06.01.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |