EP0639419 - A rasp hub assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B & J MANUFACTURING COMPANY 700 West 193rd Street Glenwood Illinois 60425 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states B & J MANUFACTURING COMPANY 700 West 193rd Street Glenwood Illinois 60425 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Wayne E. 2551 Oakwood Drive Olympia Fields, Illinois 60461 / US | 02 /
Stanfield, Charles K. 3672 Edwards Drive Crete, Illinois 60417 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 94650018.8 | 12.08.1994 | [1995/08] | Priority number, date | US19930109626 | 20.08.1993 Original published format: US 109626 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639419 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639419 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23D71/02 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
B23D71/02 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1815 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1962 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | Eine Nabe für Raspelsatz | [1995/08] | English: | A rasp hub assembly | [1995/08] | French: | Un moyeu pour jeu de râpe | [1996/02] |
Former [1995/08] | Un moyen pour jeu de râpe | Examination procedure | 02.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4012819 (WILLINGER KARL [AT]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 38 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [AD]US4019234 (JENSEN WAYNE E, et al) [AD] 1* column A; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US5033175 (JENSEN WAYNE E [US]) [AD] 1-19 * column W * |