EP0660095 - Method and apparatus for measuring the axial load on a valve stem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRANE NUCLEAR, INC. 100 First Stamford Place Stamford, Connecticut 06902 / US | [1997/50] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states CRANE COMPANY 100 First Stamford Place Stamford, Connecticut 06902 / US | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Paul Gene 139 Dripping Rock Trail Acworth, Georgia 30101 / US | 02 /
Smith, Christopher Paul 4759 Ridgetop Court Acworth, Georgia 30102 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 94650037.8 | 06.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930169256 | 20.12.1993 Original published format: US 169256 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0660095 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0660095 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660095 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
G01L5/0061 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/12 (KR);
G01M99/007 (KR);
Y10T137/8175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Messung der axialen Last eines Ventilschafts | [1995/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring the axial load on a valve stem | [1995/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil de mesure de la charge axiale d'une tige de soupape | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.1998 | SE | 08.07.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/44] | SE | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4570903 (CRASS OTTO G [US]) [A] 1-10* column W *; | [A]US4930228 (ANDERSON PAUL G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column W * |