EP0609178 - Method and apparatus for bidirectional transmission of information (protocol) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gut, Max B., Dipl.-Ing. ETH Ahornweg 15 6353 Weggis / CH | [1996/47] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states ROYALE CONSULTANTS Ltd. Third floor, 27-29 Pembroke Street Dublin 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gut, Max B., Dipl.-Ing. ETH Ahornweg 15 CH-6353 Weggis / CH | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | OK pat AG Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254 CH-6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810033.4 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | CH19930000221 | 26.01.1993 Original published format: CH 22193 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609178 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609178 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/40 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/4135 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur bidirektionalen Informationsübertragung (Protokoll) | [1994/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for bidirectional transmission of information (protocol) | [1994/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transmission d'information bidirectionelle (protocole) | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 27.03.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3223831 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,10-13* page 7, line 24 - page 12, line 2 *; | [A]EP0452124 (NCR CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 41 *; | [A]GB2252222 (RACAL CORP CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 3, line 1 - line 25 * * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 10 * * page 9, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]EP0520877 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 2 * * column 8, line 24 - line 47 * * column 9, line 9 - line 11 *; | [A] - J. HOFMANN, "THE CONSUMER ELECTRONIC BUS INFRARED SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK US, (199105), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/30.79318, pages 122 - 128, XP000327229 [A] 1,3,4,6,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.79318 |