EP0664497 - Signal for transmitting information, in particular time information over two wires in a clock installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UHRENFABRIK W. MOSER-BAER A.G. CH-3454 Sumiswald / CH | [1995/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urs, Moser Spitalstrasse 32 CH-3454 Sumiswald / CH | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810041.7 | 24.01.1994 | [1995/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664497 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664497 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G04G9/00 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
G04G9/0011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/22] |
Former [1995/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signal zum Übertragen von Informationen, insbesondere Zeitinformationen über eine Zweidrahtleitung bei einer Uhrenanlage | [1995/30] | English: | Signal for transmitting information, in particular time information over two wires in a clock installation | [1995/30] | French: | Signal pour la transmission d'informations, particulièrement, l'information de temps à travers deux fils dans une installation d'horloges | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, LU, MC, PT | 16.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.05.1998 | FR | 27.05.1998 | GB | 27.05.1998 | IT | 27.05.1998 | NL | 27.05.1998 | SE | 27.08.1998 | IE | 11.12.1998 | AT | 24.01.1999 | BE | 31.01.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 27.05.1998 | |
GB | 27.05.1998 | ||
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
NL | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
AT | 24.01.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 27.05.1998 | |
GB | 27.05.1998 | ||
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
AT | 24.01.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
AT | 24.01.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/51] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
IE | 27.05.1998 | ||
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
AT | 24.01.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
IE | 27.05.1998 | ||
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
IE | 27.05.1998 | ||
IT | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
IE | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | IE | 27.05.1998 | |
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 27.05.1998 | |
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 27.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2525631 (SIEMENS AG)[D] 1-14; | [A]FR2447572 (FLONIC SA) [A] 1-14 * page 9, line 1 - line 35; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0335797 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |