Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3323318B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2002 | B2 | JPH07304158 | 21.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0611258 | Global Dossier | 03.09.1997 | B1 | EP0611258 | 17.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE157595T | 15.09.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH686883 | 31.07.1996 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ30794 | 17.08.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59403901D1 | 09.10.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0611258T | 30.03.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2108405T | 16.12.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU213811 | 28.10.1997 | B | HUT71274 | 28.11.1995 | A | HU9400377D0 | 30.05.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5456170 | 10.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CH43993 | 12.02.1993 |