EP0668383 - Shuttle brake and dummy shuttle loom with shuttle brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULZER RÜTI AG CH-8630 Rüti / CH | [1995/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bucher, Robert Frickbergstrasse CH-5262 Frick / CH | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1995/34] | Heubeck, Bernhard c/o Sulzer Management AG, KS/Patente/0007, Postfach 414 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810095.3 | 18.02.1994 | [1995/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668383 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/24, D03D49/54 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
D03D47/24 (EP);
D03D49/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [1995/46] |
Former [1995/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fangbremse und Projektilwebmaschine mit Fangbremse | [1995/34] | English: | Shuttle brake and dummy shuttle loom with shuttle brake | [1995/34] | French: | Frein pour projectiles et métier à projectiles avec un frein pour projectiles | [1995/34] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU | 24.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/47] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.1995 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.04.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0214575 (ZELLWEGER); | [A]EP0189495 (SULZER); | [A]EP0189496 (SULZER); | [AD]US3563281 (PFARWALLER); | [AD]CH469839 (SULZER) |