EP0619290 - Salts of alkaline earth metals and transition metals as well as complexes of transition metals of ketocarboxylic acids and their use as corrosion inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armstrong, William Paul, Dr. 5 Glenside Parade Belfast BT148AH / GB | 02 /
Braig, Adalbert, Dr. Baselstrasse 20 D-79589 Binzen / DE | 03 /
Frey, Markus, Dr. Route du Centre 19 CH-1723 Marly / CH | 04 /
Kramer, Andreas, Dr. Bundtels 3 CH-3186 Düdingen / CH | [1994/41] | Application number, filing date | 94810183.7 | 23.03.1994 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | CH19930001059 | 07.04.1993 Original published format: CH 105993 | [1994/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0619290 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0619290 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619290 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/84, C07C59/88, C07C51/41, C09D5/08 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
C07C59/84 (EP,US);
C07C205/56 (EP,US);
C07C59/88 (EP,US);
C07C59/90 (EP,US);
C09D5/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | Erdalkalimetallsalze, Uebergangsmetallsalze und Uebergangsmetallkomplexe von Ketocarbonsäuren als Korrosionsinhibitoren | [1994/41] | English: | Salts of alkaline earth metals and transition metals as well as complexes of transition metals of ketocarboxylic acids and their use as corrosion inhibitors | [1994/41] | French: | Sels de métaux alcalino-terreux et de transition ainsi que les complexes de métaux de transition d'acides cétocarboxyliques et leur emploi en tant qu'inhibiteurs de corrosion | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3382081 (CUTTER PAUL R, et al)[A] 1-22; | [X]DE2021445 (CLIN BYLA ETS [FR]) [X] 1-4,6 * Vgl. Verb. 844Ca, 804Ca, 788Ca, 791Ca, Beispiele 1b, 7c, 17b und 21c *; | [A]EP0144663 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-22; | [X]EP0300325 (COMETEC SRL [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * Vgl. Beispiel VIII *; | [DA]US4909987 (PENNINGER JOSEF [DE], et al); | [DA]EP0412933 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-22; | [DA]EP0496555 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-22 |