EP0625458 - Vehicle bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse Technology & Management AG Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [1996/40] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states ALUSUISSE-LONZA SERVICES AG CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kampmann, Lutz Vordergasse 75 CH-8213 Neunkirch / CH | [1994/47] | Application number, filing date | 94810240.5 | 28.04.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | CH19930001528 | 19.05.1993 Original published format: CH 152893 | [1994/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625458 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/04, B62D27/06 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B62D27/06 (EP);
B61D17/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugaufbauten | [1994/47] | English: | Vehicle bodies | [1994/47] | French: | Carrosseries de véhicules | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 10.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/29] | 03.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0146706 (MESSERSCMITT - BÖLKOW - BLOHM GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 30; figure 1 * |