EP0627164 - Microbicidal compositions comprising prochloraz and cyprodinil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2001/27] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeun, Ronald, Dr. Pfarrer-Christen-Strasse 7 D-79395 Neuenburg / DE | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Bastian, Werner Maria, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Bastian, Werner Maria, et al Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810303.1 | 26.05.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | CH19930001674 | 04.06.1993 Original published format: CH 167493 | [1994/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627164 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627164 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0627164 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/38, // (A01N47/38, 43:54) | [1994/49] | CPC: |
A01N47/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/38, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/38, A01N43/54 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/49] | Title | German: | Mikrobizide Mischungen die Prochloraz und Cyprodinil enthalten | [1994/49] | English: | Microbicidal compositions comprising prochloraz and cyprodinil | [1994/49] | French: | Compositions microbicides, contenant du prochloraz et du cyprodinil | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.1997
ADMISSIBLE MAKHTESHIM CHEMICAL WORKS LTD. P.O. Box 60 Beer-Sheva 84100 / IL Opponent's representative Modiano, Guido Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [1997/24] | 26.05.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.09.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.06.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/37] | GB | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2516349 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 20 ** page 4, line 28 *; | [DY]EP0310550 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DY] 1-11 * page 12, line 7 - line 13 *; | [Y]GB2258615 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 9 - line 13 *; | [PY]EP0548025 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [PY] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - line 37 *; | [PY]EP0556157 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [PY] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - line 36 *; | [PY]GB2267644 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [PY] 1-11 * page 1, line 17 - line 24 * * page 2, line 17 - line 19 * * page 10 * | Examination | EP0072156 |