|
23.08.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.06.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.1998 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |