EP0651001 - Cross-linking of polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/29] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states "BRUGG"-KABEL AG Klosterzelgstrasse 28 CH-5200 Brugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heese, Ulrich Hauptstrasse 56 CH-5243 Mülligen / CH | 02 /
Salvel, Renato Grubenackerstrasse 95 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/32] |
Former [1995/18] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 CH-8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810610.9 | 24.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | CH19930003307 | 03.11.1993 Original published format: CH 330793 | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651001 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651001 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Vernetzung von Polymeren | [1995/18] | English: | Cross-linking of polymers | [1995/18] | French: | Réticulation de polymères | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.1999
09.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.1999
09.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2000/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.1999
Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department Velperweg 76, Postbus 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 19.01.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.08.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2000 | GB | 24.10.2000 | IE | 24.10.2000 | ES | 25.10.2000 | SE | 30.10.2000 | BE | 31.10.2000 | CH | 31.10.2000 | LI | 31.10.2000 | NL | 01.05.2001 | FR | 29.06.2001 | DE | 03.07.2001 | [2004/28] |
Former [2002/29] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
GB | 24.10.2000 | ||
IE | 24.10.2000 | ||
SE | 30.10.2000 | ||
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
CH | 31.10.2000 | ||
LI | 31.10.2000 | ||
NL | 01.05.2001 | ||
FR | 29.06.2001 | ||
DE | 03.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
GB | 24.10.2000 | ||
IE | 24.10.2000 | ||
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
CH | 31.10.2000 | ||
LI | 31.10.2000 | ||
NL | 01.05.2001 | ||
FR | 29.06.2001 | ||
DE | 03.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
GB | 24.10.2000 | ||
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
CH | 31.10.2000 | ||
LI | 31.10.2000 | ||
NL | 01.05.2001 | ||
DE | 03.07.2001 | ||
IE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
GB | 24.10.2000 | ||
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
CH | 31.10.2000 | ||
LI | 31.10.2000 | ||
NL | 01.05.2001 | ||
IE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
GB | 24.10.2000 | ||
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
NL | 01.05.2001 | ||
IE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 24.10.2000 | |
BE | 31.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 31.10.2000 | |
IE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | IE | 11.07.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2213202 (DIPOLITH GMBH CHEMIE WERKSTOFF) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * claims 1,2 * * page 6, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]FR2245702 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * claim 1 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0030757 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0210306 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [A] 1,6,8,9 * claim 18 ** page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 28 *; | [Y]EP0459208 (HIMONT INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * claims 1,2,9 * |