EP0615689 - A mechanical device for automatically turning over and stretching preformed dough portions in bread processing and making systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vismara, Mario Andrea 6, Lacet, Saint Leon MC-98000 Principato Di Monaco / MC | [1995/19] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states Vismara, Mario Andrea Boulevard d'Italie, 74 Monte Carlo / MC | ||
For all designated states Monterotti, Enzo Via Aspromonte, 13 I-20013 Magenta (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94830017.3 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI00504 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: IT MI930504 | [1994/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615689 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615689 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A21C9/08, A21C3/02 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
A21C9/08 (EP);
A21C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umdrehen und Strecken von vorgeformten Teigteilen | [1994/38] | English: | A mechanical device for automatically turning over and stretching preformed dough portions in bread processing and making systems | [1994/38] | French: | Appareil de retournement et élirage de morceaux de pâte préformés | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.08.1997 | LI | 27.08.1997 | NL | 27.08.1997 | SE | 27.11.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/15] | CH | 27.08.1997 | |
LI | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0392584 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER HATON BV [NL]) |